AZ HB2830 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Chapter 424
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Alternative organization; community college districts

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alternative organization; community college districts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-09SenateChapter 424
2021-07-09SenateGovernor Signed
2021-06-30SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-06-30HouseTransmit to House
2021-06-30SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0)
2021-05-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-05-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-04-01SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-04-01SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-04-01SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-03-31SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-1-0)
2021-03-23SenateSenate ED Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-03-03SenateSenate read second time
2021-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2021-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-02-25SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-02-24HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2021-02-22HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-02-22HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-16HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-09HouseHouse read second time
2021-02-08HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-02-08HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2021-02-08HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
151402.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/76027
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2830p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2830h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2830s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/laws/0424.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.2830gowan.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.2830alston.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.2830gowan2.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.2830approp.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.2830floorgowan.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.2830gray0436sit cow.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484154
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484812
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485543
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487568
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488205
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488399
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/489849
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/489860
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/490444
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/490502
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76027&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76027&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76027&billStatusActionId=201743&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76027&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76027&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76027&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76027&billStatusActionId=204272&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76027&billStatusActionId=204300&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76027&billStatusActionId=204631&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback