AZ HB2830 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic stops; police cars; uniforms
Title
Traffic stops; police cars; uniforms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-19 | House | House PS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-12 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to House PS Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 622.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 629 | New Code | See Bill Text |