AZ HB2828 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Solar; electric vehicle batteries; disposal
Title
Solar; electric vehicle batteries; disposal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-18 | House | House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-5-0-1-0-0) |
2020-02-12 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |