AZ HB2823 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Ambulance service; interfacility transfers
Title
Ambulance service; interfacility transfers
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Weninger [R] | Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Sen. Frank Carroll [R] | Rep. Regina Cobb [R] |
Rep. Travis Grantham [R] | Rep. Robert Meza [D] | Sen. Warren Petersen [R] | Sen. Karen Fann [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2020-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2020-02-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-18 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-12 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 2201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2232 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2233 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2233.01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2234 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2235.01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2236 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2237 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2240 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2245 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2247 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |