AZ HB2818 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - House RULES Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - House RULES Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
CTE; articulated credit; statewide agreement
Title
CTE; articulated credit; statewide agreement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-15 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-09 | House | House read second time |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Articulated Credit
Career Technical Education (cte)
Cte (see Also: Career Technical Education)
Education - Title 15
Statewide Agreement
Career Technical Education (cte)
Cte (see Also: Career Technical Education)
Education - Title 15
Statewide Agreement