AZ HB2816 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Chapter 270
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Chapter 270
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Children and families special plates
Title
Children and families special plates
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Wilmeth [R] | Sen. Frank Carroll [R] | Rep. Joseph Chaplik [R] | Sen. Steve Kaiser [R] |
Sen. John Kavanagh [R] | Rep. Ben Toma [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Senate | Chapter 270 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-14 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (38-21-1-0) |
2021-04-14 | House | House concurs |
2021-04-13 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2021-04-13 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2021-04-08 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-2-2-0) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate TAT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TAT Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (45-14-1-0) |
2021-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-17 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-09 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 2351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 2403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 2469 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6991 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6993 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |