AZ HB2810 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Chapter 327
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Civil asset forfeiture; conviction; procedures

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil asset forfeiture; conviction; procedures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Criminal Justice Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-05SenateChapter 327
2021-05-05SenateGovernor Signed
2021-04-29SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-04-28HouseTransmit to House
2021-04-28SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0)
2021-04-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2021-03-23SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-23SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-22SenateSenate consent calendar
2021-03-22SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-03-11SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2021-03-03SenateSenate read second time
2021-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-02-25SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-02-24HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (57-2-1-0)
2021-02-22HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-02-22HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-17HouseHouse CJR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-09HouseHouse read second time
2021-02-08HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-02-08HouseAssigned to House CJR Committee
2021-02-08HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
132314Amended CodeSee Bill Text
132314.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
132314.03Amended CodeSee Bill Text
133413Amended CodeSee Bill Text
133914Amended CodeSee Bill Text
133919Amended CodeSee Bill Text
133920Amended CodeSee Bill Text
133921Amended CodeSee Bill Text
133942Amended CodeSee Bill Text
134301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
134303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
134304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
134305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
134306Amended CodeSee Bill Text
134307Amended CodeSee Bill Text
134308Amended CodeSee Bill Text
134309Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
134310Amended CodeSee Bill Text
134311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
134312Amended CodeSee Bill Text
134314Amended CodeSee Bill Text
134315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
412407Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/76007
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2810p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2810h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/laws/0327.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484353
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485063
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485803
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486787
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/489358
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/489436
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76007&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76007&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76007&billStatusActionId=201739&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76007&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76007&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76007&billStatusActionId=203885&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76007&billStatusActionId=203896&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback