AZ HB2808 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-6)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Prisoners; release credits

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prisoners; release credits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03SenateSenate read second time
2020-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2020-03-02SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-02-28SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-02-27HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2020-02-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-02-25HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-25HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2020-02-25HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2020-02-19HouseHouse JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-1-0-0)
2020-02-12HouseHouse read second time
2020-02-11HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-02-11HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2020-02-11HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
134413Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31229.02Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31281Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411604.07Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74094
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2808p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2808h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.2808allen j.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.2808allen j2.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/h.2808judiciary.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74094&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74094&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74094&billStatusActionId=194626&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74094&billStatusActionId=194694&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback