AZ HB2806 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriations; preschool development grants

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations; preschool development grants

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-03-10HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-03-09HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-19HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-1-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-13HouseHouse JUD Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-11HouseHouse read second time
2020-02-10HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-02-10HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2020-02-10HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2020-02-10HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback