AZ HB2787 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Water and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Water; augmentation authority; special districts

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water; augmentation authority; special districts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03SenateSenate read second time
2020-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate WAG Committee
2020-03-02SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-02-28SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-02-27HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-2-0-0)
2020-02-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-02-25HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-25HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-25HouseHouse consent calendar
2020-02-25HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2020-02-18HouseHouse NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-1-0-0-0)
2020-02-11HouseHouse read second time
2020-02-10HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-02-10HouseAssigned to House NREW Committee
2020-02-10HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
451972Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481019Amended CodeSee Bill Text
48901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
48909Amended CodeSee Bill Text
48909.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback