AZ HB2786 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-22 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-22 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Voting; registration; drop boxes; prohibition
Title
Voting; registration; drop boxes; prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - Motion Representative Toma motioned that pursuant to House Rule 12(O) HB 2786 be referred for an additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - Motion Representative Toma motioned that pursuant to House Rule 12(O) HB 2786 be referred for an additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-03-01 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-26-3-0) |
2022-03-01 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-03-01 | House | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-24 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2022-02-24 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (27-32-1-0) |
2022-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2022-02-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-22 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-02-16 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-10 | House | House read second time |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Active Early Voting List (s)
Ballot Drop Boxes (s)
Ballot Requests
Civil Penalties (s)
Classification (s)
Definition (s)
Early Ballot Request (s)
Elections And Electors (s)
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Prohibition (s)
Request For Ballot (s)
Signature Exemplar (s)
Sources
Vehicles (s)
Violation (s)
Voter Registration
Ballot Drop Boxes (s)
Ballot Requests
Civil Penalties (s)
Classification (s)
Definition (s)
Early Ballot Request (s)
Elections And Electors (s)
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Prohibition (s)
Request For Ballot (s)
Signature Exemplar (s)
Sources
Vehicles (s)
Violation (s)
Voter Registration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 167 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 542 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 544 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |