AZ HB2781 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-08 - House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-08 - House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Well ownership; sale; council recommendations
Title
Well ownership; sale; council recommendations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-25 | House WE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-1-0-0-0) | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to House WE Committee | |
2010-02-11 | House read second time | |
2010-02-10 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-10 | Assigned to House WE Committee | |
2010-02-10 | Introduced in House and read first time |
Arizona State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=93&Bill_Number=HB2781 |
Text | http://www.azleg.gov/legtext/49leg/2r/bills/hb2781p.htm |