AZ HB2764 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Note: Legislation replaced by SB1523

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Mental health omnibus.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental health omnibus.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-02-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2020-02-26HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-26HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-26HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-24HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-1-0-0)
2020-02-20HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-06HouseHouse read second time
2020-02-04HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-02-04HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2020-02-04HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2020-02-04HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Same As/Similar To

SB1523 (Replaced by) 2020-03-03 - Chapter 4

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
201138New CodeSee Bill Text
20157.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
363436New CodeSee Bill Text
363436.01New CodeSee Bill Text
363504Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/73860
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2764p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2764h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.2764barto.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/h.2764health human services.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.2764cobb.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/h.2764appropriations.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73860&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73860&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73860&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73860&billStatusActionId=194601&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73860&billStatusActionId=195053&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback