AZ HB2762 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Project rocket pilot program; appropriations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Project rocket pilot program; appropriations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-25HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-25HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-25HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2020-02-19HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-2-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-10HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-2-1-1-0-0)
2020-02-06HouseHouse read second time
2020-02-05HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-02-05HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2020-02-05HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2020-02-05HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/73830
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2762p.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.2762udall.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.2762udall2.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/h.2762education.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.2762udall3.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.2762udall4.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.2762lieberman.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.2762lieberman3.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/h.2762appropriations.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73830&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73830&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73830&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2

Bill Comments

feedback