AZ HB2762 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Project rocket pilot program; appropriations
Title
Project rocket pilot program; appropriations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2020-02-19 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-2-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-10 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-2-1-1-0-0) |
2020-02-06 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |