AZ HB2760 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Chapter 297
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Chapter 297
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Contractors; qualifying party; liability
Title
Contractors; qualifying party; liability
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Dunn [R] | Rep. Joanne Osborne [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Senate | Chapter 297 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-22 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2021-04-22 | House | House concurs |
2021-04-20 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2021-04-20 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2021-04-13 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (54-4-2-0) |
2021-02-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-15 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-08 | House | House LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-2-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-03 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Assigned to House LARA Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Contractors (h)
Effective Date (h)
Fund
Legislative Intent (h)
Liability (h)
Licensure Regulation (h)
Military Affairs And Emergency Management - Title 26
Military Installations
Professions And Occupations - Title 32 (h)
Property Conveyance
Qualifying Party (h)
Retroactivity (h)
Severability (h)
State Government - Title 41
Strike Everything Amendment (h)
Effective Date (h)
Fund
Legislative Intent (h)
Liability (h)
Licensure Regulation (h)
Military Affairs And Emergency Management - Title 26
Military Installations
Professions And Occupations - Title 32 (h)
Property Conveyance
Qualifying Party (h)
Retroactivity (h)
Severability (h)
State Government - Title 41
Strike Everything Amendment (h)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
26 | 262 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 2752 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |