AZ HB2758 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Note: Replaces legislation SB1545

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 34-2)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Chapter 276
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Empowerment scholarships; qualified school

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Empowerment scholarships; qualified school

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Senate - Motion HB 2758 substituted for SB 1545. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06SenateChapter 276
2019-06-06SenateGovernor Signed
2019-05-27SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-05-24HouseTransmit to House
2019-05-24SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (27-0-3-0)
2019-05-24SenateSenate miscellaneous motion: HB 2758 substituted for SB 1545. Motion carried.
2019-05-24SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-05-24SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-05-24HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2019-05-23HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-05-23HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2019-05-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-05-23HouseHouse read second time
2019-05-23HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-3-0-1-0-0)
2019-05-23HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-05-21HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-05-21HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2019-05-21HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Same As/Similar To

SB1545 (Replaces) 2019-05-24 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72437
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2758p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2758h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0276.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72437&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72437&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72437&billStatusActionId=189733&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72437&billStatusActionId=189741&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72437&billStatusActionId=189797&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72437&billStatusActionId=189798&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback