AZ HB2758 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Replaces legislation SB1545
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 34-2)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Chapter 276
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 34-2)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Chapter 276
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Empowerment scholarships; qualified school
Title
Empowerment scholarships; qualified school
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Senate - Motion HB 2758 substituted for SB 1545. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Senate - Motion HB 2758 substituted for SB 1545. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Chapter 276 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-24 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-0-3-0) |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: HB 2758 substituted for SB 1545. Motion carried. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-05-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2019-05-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-05-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2019-05-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-05-23 | House | House read second time |
2019-05-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-3-0-1-0-0) |
2019-05-23 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-05-21 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-05-21 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2019-05-21 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1545 (Replaces) 2019-05-24 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass