AZ HB2750 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Note: Replaces legislation SB1552

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Chapter 266
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Higher education; budget reconciliation; 2019-2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher education; budget reconciliation; 2019-2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - Senate - Motion HB 2750 substituted for SB 1552. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31SenateChapter 266
2019-05-31SenateGovernor Signed
2019-05-27SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-05-27HouseTransmit to House
2019-05-27SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (17-12-1-0)
2019-05-27SenateSenate miscellaneous motion: HB 2750 substituted for SB 1552. Motion carried.
2019-05-27SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-05-25SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-05-25HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0)
2019-05-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-05-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-05-23HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-05-23HouseHouse read second time
2019-05-23HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-3-0-1-0-0)
2019-05-22HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-4-0-0-0-0)
2019-05-21HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-05-21HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2019-05-21HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Same As/Similar To

SB1552 (Replaces) 2019-05-27 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
151444Amended CodeSee Bill Text
151642Amended CodeSee Bill Text
151647Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
151655Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
151670Amended CodeSee Bill Text
35146Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72420
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2750p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2750h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0266.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72420&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72420&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72420&billStatusActionId=189809&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72420&billStatusActionId=189814&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72420&billStatusActionId=189891&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72420&billStatusActionId=189922&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback