AZ HB2747 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-03 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-03 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Broadband; fiber optic services; committee
Title
Broadband; fiber optic services; committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TAT Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (38-20-2-0) |
2021-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-16 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-1-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-03 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |