AZ HB2737 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Corporation commission actions; investigation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corporation commission actions; investigation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-23HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2021-02-16HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-16HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-15HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-09HouseHouse NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-02HouseHouse read second time
2021-02-01HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-02-01HouseAssigned to House NREW Committee
2021-02-01HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41194.02New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/75551
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2737p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2737h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/h.2737parker2.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/h.2737natural resources energy water.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/482237
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484284
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484966
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75551&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75551&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75551&billStatusActionId=201241&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75551&billStatusActionId=202755&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback