AZ HB2734 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-27 - Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-27 - Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Prime contracting; study committee
Title
Prime contracting; study committee
Sponsors
Rep. Regina Cobb [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-02-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-20 | House | House WM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-14 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 1516 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1532 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 1103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5007 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5008.01 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5029 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5029.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5032.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5032.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5075 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5077 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5155 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5159 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5160 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 6001.01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 6004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 6102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1072.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1072.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
44 | 1263 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 290 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |