AZ HB2728 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - House RULES Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - House RULES Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Biometric identifiers; commercial purpose; consent
Title
Biometric identifiers; commercial purpose; consent
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | House | House RULES Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-12 | House | House TECH Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-1-2-0-0-0) |
2020-02-10 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | Assigned to House TECH Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |