AZ HB2726 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-12 - Senate NRT Committee action: Held
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-12 - Senate NRT Committee action: Held
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental audit privilege
Title
Environmental audit privilege
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House Environment Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House Environment Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Senate NRT Committee action: Held | |
2012-02-28 | Referred to Senate NRT Committee | |
2012-02-28 | Senate read second time | |
2012-02-27 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-27 | Assigned to Senate NRT Committee | |
2012-02-27 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-02-24 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-02-23 | House third reading PASSED voting: (38-18-3-0) | |
2012-02-23 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-21 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-21 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-20 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-0-0) | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-14 | House ENV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-0-0-0) | |
2012-02-02 | Referred to House ENV Committee | |
2012-02-02 | House read second time | |
2012-02-01 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-01 | Assigned to House ENV Committee | |
2012-02-01 | Introduced in House and read first time |