AZ HB2724 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Chapter 132
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Chapter 132
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Assisted living; distance requirements; prohibition
Title
Assisted living; distance requirements; prohibition
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Toma [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | Chapter 132 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-04-04 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-0-4-0) |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-1-1-0) |
2022-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-15 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-09 | House | House read second time |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Administrative Procedures (s)
Assisted Living
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Counties - Title 11
Definition (s)
Distance Requirements
Local Planning
Notice (s)
Prohibition
Assisted Living
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Counties - Title 11
Definition (s)
Distance Requirements
Local Planning
Notice (s)
Prohibition
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 820.02 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 462.09 | New Code | See Bill Text |