AZ HB2722 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Chapter 267
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Chapter 267
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Strategic actions; public participation
Title
Strategic actions; public participation
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Toma [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Chapter 267 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-05-25 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (31-26-3-0) |
2022-05-25 | House | House concurs |
2022-05-25 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2022-05-25 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2022-05-23 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-12-1-0) |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-1-0) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-22 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (40-19-1-0) |
2022-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-16 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-2-0-0) |
2022-02-10 | House | House read second time |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Government (s)
Justice And Municipal Courts - Title 22 (s)
Motion To Dismiss (s)
Public Participation
Severability (s)
Strategic Actions
Government (s)
Justice And Municipal Courts - Title 22 (s)
Motion To Dismiss (s)
Public Participation
Severability (s)
Strategic Actions
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 2101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
12 | 751 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |