AZ HB2705 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-7)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Chapter 268
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-7)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Chapter 268
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; dress codes; graduation ceremonies
Title
Schools; dress codes; graduation ceremonies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Senate | Chapter 268 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-13 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-6-0-0) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-2-1-0) |
2021-02-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-08 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-02 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-28 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |