AZ HB2703 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-12 - Senate minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-12 - Senate minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Supervisors; legislative vacancy; appointment
Title
Supervisors; legislative vacancy; appointment
Sponsors
Rep. Alexander Kolodin [R] | Rep. Tim Dunn [R] | Rep. Justin Heap [R] | Rep. Laurin Hendrix [R] |
Rep. Rachel Jones [R] | Rep. Cory McGarr [R] | Rep. Jacqueline Parker [R] | Rep. Austin Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate ELEC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-20 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-1-2-0) |
2024-02-13 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-13 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-12 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-02-12 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-07 | House | House MOE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-05 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Assigned to House MOE Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |