AZ HB2699 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - House minority caucus: Hold
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - House minority caucus: Hold
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Child prostitution; classification
Title
Child prostitution; classification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | House minority caucus: Hold | |
2010-04-13 | House majority caucus: Hold | |
2010-04-12 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-05 | Senate third reading , voting: (28-0-2-0) | |
2010-04-01 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-03-30 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-30 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-29 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-03-17 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-24 | Senate PSHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) | |
2010-03-17 | Referred to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-17 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-15 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-15 | House third reading , voting: (47-7-5-0) | |
2010-03-04 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-03-01 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-01 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-01 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-18 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2010-02-11 | House read second time | |
2010-02-10 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-10 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2010-02-10 | Introduced in House and read first time |