AZ HB2692 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Chapter 267
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Chapter 267
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Right-hand driving; transfer notice; education
Title
Right-hand driving; transfer notice; education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Senate | Chapter 267 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-14 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (50-9-1-0) |
2021-04-14 | House | House concurs |
2021-04-13 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2021-04-13 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2021-04-07 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate TAT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TAT Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (49-10-1-0) |
2021-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2021-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-17 | House | House TRANS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (12-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-03 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Defensive Driving School (h)
Department Of Transportation (h)
Driving On Right
Education
Effective Date
Right-hand Driving
Traffic
Transfer Notice
Transportation - Title 28
Vehicle Regulation
Department Of Transportation (h)
Driving On Right
Education
Effective Date
Right-hand Driving
Traffic
Transfer Notice
Transportation - Title 28
Vehicle Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 2060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 721 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |