AZ HB2691 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Chapter 330
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Health care workforce; grant programs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care workforce; grant programs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-06-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 9 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-24 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-29SenateChapter 330
2022-06-29SenateGovernor Signed
2022-06-24SenateTransmitted to Governor
2022-06-24HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (42-9-9-0)
2022-06-24HouseHouse concurs
2022-06-24HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2022-06-24HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2022-06-23HouseTransmit to House
2022-06-23SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (25-0-5-0)
2022-06-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2022-06-22SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2022-06-22SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2022-06-20SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2022-03-22SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-2-0)
2022-03-09SenateSenate read second time
2022-03-08SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2022-03-08SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2022-03-08SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2022-02-25SenateTransmit to Senate
2022-02-24HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (44-15-1-0)
2022-02-24HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2022-02-23HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2022-02-22HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2022-02-22HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2022-02-22HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2022-02-16HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-2-1-0-0-0)
2022-02-08HouseHouse read second time
2022-02-07HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2022-02-07HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2022-02-07HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
151898Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/77752
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2r/bills/hb2691p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2r/bills/hb2691h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2r/bills/hb2691s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2r/laws/0330.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2R/proposed/H.2691OSBORNE.DOCX.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2R/adopted/H.2691APPROPRIATIONS.DOCX.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2R/adopted/S.2691FLOORGOWAN.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/494344
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/495227
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/495890
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/497386
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/500088
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/500140
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/500018
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=77752&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=77752&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=77752&billStatusActionId=208831&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=77752&billStatusActionId=209203&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=77752&billStatusActionId=209338&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=77752&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=77752&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=77752&billStatusActionId=211876&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=77752&billStatusActionId=211984&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=77752&billStatusActionId=212090&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=77752&billStatusActionId=212097&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback