AZ HB2691 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Chapter 325
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Chapter 325
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
ADEQ; water quality program; WOTUS
Title
ADEQ; water quality program; WOTUS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Senate | Chapter 325 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-28 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0) |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-03-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0) |
2021-03-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2021-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2021-02-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-16 | House | House NREW Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-08 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-04 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Arizona Department Of Environmental Quality
Groundwater Permits
Technical Correction
The Environment - Title 49
Water Quality Control
Water Quality Program
Waters - Title 45
Wotus
Groundwater Permits
Technical Correction
The Environment - Title 49
Water Quality Control
Water Quality Program
Waters - Title 45
Wotus
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 202.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 210 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 225 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 231 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 232 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 233 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 234 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 242 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 245.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 245.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 250 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 255.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 255.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 255.03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 255.04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 255.05 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 256 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 256.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 256.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 261 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 262 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 371 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 391 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |