AZ HB2690 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

State agencies; veterans status; inquiry

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State agencies; veterans status; inquiry

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Military & Veterans Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-18HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-17HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2020-02-17HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-10HouseHouse MVA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0-0-0)
2020-02-04HouseHouse read second time
2020-02-03HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-02-03HouseAssigned to House MVA Committee
2020-02-03HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41110New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback