AZ HB2686 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Note: Replaces legislation SB1222

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Chapter 3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Building permits; utilities; restrictions; prohibitions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Building permits; utilities; restrictions; prohibitions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Motion HB 2686 substituted for SB 1222. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-21SenateChapter 3
2020-02-21SenateGovernor Signed
2020-02-18SenateTransmitted to Governor
2020-02-13HouseTransmit to House
2020-02-13SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (19-10-1-0)
2020-02-13SenateSenate miscellaneous motion: HB 2686 substituted for SB 1222. Motion carried.
2020-02-13SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-02-12SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-02-12HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (36-23-0-1)
2020-02-12HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-02-04HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-04HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-03HouseHouse consent calendar
2020-02-03HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
2020-01-28HouseHouse NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-5-0-0-0-0)
2020-01-27HouseHouse read second time
2020-01-22HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-01-22HouseAssigned to House NREW Committee
2020-01-22HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Same As/Similar To

SB1222 (Replaces) 2020-02-13 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
11867New CodeSee Bill Text
9467Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9810New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/73413
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2686p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2686h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/laws/0003.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73413&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73413&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73413&billStatusActionId=193315&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73413&billStatusActionId=193320&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73413&billStatusActionId=193547&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73413&billStatusActionId=193555&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback