AZ HB2683 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-24 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-24 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
CTEDs; service agreements; letter grades
Title
CTEDs; service agreements; letter grades
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate HEWD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-0-3-0) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HEWD Committee |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-03-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-1-1-0) |
2019-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-20 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-0-2-0-0) |
2019-02-18 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-0-1-0-0) |
2019-02-13 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-12 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 393.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |