AZ HB2682 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Schools; instruction; Holocaust; genocides

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; instruction; Holocaust; genocides

Sponsors

Rep. Alma Hernandez [D]Rep. John Allen [R]Rep. Richard Andrade [D]Rep. Leo Biasiucci [R]
Rep. Walter Blackman [R]Rep. Isela Blanc [D]Rep. Reginald Bolding [D]Rep. Shawnna Bolick [R]
Rep. Russell Bowers [R]Rep. Kelli Butler [D]Rep. Noel Campbell [R]Rep. Andres Cano [D]
Rep. Frank Carroll [R]Rep. Cesar Chavez [D]Rep. Regina Cobb [R]Rep. David Cook [R]
Rep. Domingo Degrazia [D]Rep. Timothy Dunn [R]Rep. Kirsten Engel [D]Rep. Denise Epstein [D]
Rep. Diego Espinoza [D]Rep. Charlene Fernandez [D]Rep. John Fillmore [R]Rep. Mark Finchem [R]
Rep. Randall Friese [D]Rep. Rosanna Gabaldon [D]Rep. Travis Grantham [R]Sen. Gail Griffin [R]
Rep. Daniel Hernandez [D]Rep. Jennifer Jermaine [D]Sen. John Kavanagh [R]Rep. Anthony Kern [R]
Rep. Jay Lawrence [R]Rep. Aaron Lieberman [D]Rep. Jennifer Longdon [D]Rep. Robert Meza [D]
Rep. Becky Nutt [R]Rep. Joanne Osborne [R]Rep. Jennifer Pawlik [D]Rep. Kevin Payne [R]
Rep. Geraldine Peten [D]Rep. Stephen Pierce [R]Rep. Pamela Hannley [D]Rep. Tony Rivero [R]
Rep. Bret Roberts [R]Rep. Diego Rodriguez [D]Rep. Athena Salman [D]Rep. Amish Shah [D]
Rep. Thomas Shope [R]Rep. Lorenzo Sierra [D]Rep. Arlando Teller [D]Rep. Raquel Teran [D]
Rep. Bob Thorpe [R]Rep. Ben Toma [R]Rep. Kelly Townsend [R]Rep. Myron Tsosie [D]
Rep. Michelle Udall [R]Rep. Jeff Weninger [R]Sen. Sylvia Allen [R]Rep. Lela Alston [D]
Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R]Sen. Sean Bowie [D]Sen. Paul Boyer [R]Sen. Kate Brophy McGee [R]
Rep. Heather Carter [R]Sen. Andrea Dalessandro [D]Rep. Karen Fann [R]Sen. David Farnsworth [R]
Rep. Sally Gonzales [D]Sen. David Gowan [R]Rep. Rick Gray [R]Sen. Sine Kerr [R]
Sen. Vince Leach [R]Sen. David Livingston [R]Rep. Javan Mesnard [R]Sen. Lisa Otondo [D]
Sen. Tyler Pace [R]Rep. Franklin Pratt [R]Sen. Martin Quezada [D]Rep. Rebecca Rios [D]
Sen. Victoria Steele [D]

Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2020-03-10SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2020-03-09SenateSenate consent calendar
2020-03-09SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-03-03SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0)
2020-02-25SenateSenate read second time
2020-02-24SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-02-24SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2020-02-24SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-02-19SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-02-19HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2020-02-04HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-04HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-03HouseHouse consent calendar
2020-02-03HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-01-27HouseHouse read second time
2020-01-27HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-3-0-0)
2020-01-22HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-01-22HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2020-01-22HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15701.02New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback