AZ HB2682 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; instruction; Holocaust; genocides
Title
Schools; instruction; Holocaust; genocides
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-02-19 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2020-02-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-03 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-02-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-27 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-27 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-3-0-0) |
2020-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |