AZ HB2677 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

JLAC; auditor general

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JLAC; auditor general

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-07 Governor Vetoed
2019-05-23 Transmitted to Governor
2019-05-23HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (60-0-0-0)
2019-05-09HouseHouse motion to reconsider third reading
2019-05-09HouseHouse final reading FAILED, voting: (28-30-2-0)
2019-05-09HouseHouse concurs
2019-05-07HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2019-05-07HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2019-05-06HouseTransmit to House
2019-05-06SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (25-4-1-0)
2019-05-06SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-05-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2019-04-17SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2019-04-16SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-16SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-01SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-03-18SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2019-03-13SenateSenate read second time
2019-03-12SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-03-12SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2019-03-12SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-03-05SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-03-04HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-26HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-26HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-25HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-20HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-1-0-0)
2019-02-14HouseHouse read second time
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2019-02-13HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
411278Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411279.02Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411279.03Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411279.04Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411279.06Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411279.07Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411279.21Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411279.22Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
412954Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72321
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2677p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2677h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2677s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.2677kern.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/h.2677appropriations.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.2677floorgray1.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72321&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72321&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72321&billStatusActionId=187256&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72321&billStatusActionId=187670&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72321&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72321&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72321&billStatusActionId=188994&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72321&billStatusActionId=189269&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72321&billStatusActionId=189378&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72321&billStatusActionId=189393&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72321&billStatusActionId=189527&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72321&billStatusActionId=189528&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72321&billStatusActionId=189529&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72321&billStatusActionId=189721&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback