AZ HB2672 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Prisoners; braille transcriber training program
Title
Prisoners; braille transcriber training program
Sponsors
Rep. Joel John [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-03-01 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (46-6-8-0) |
2021-03-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-02-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-02-10 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-1-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-08 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (14-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-02 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-01 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2021-02-01 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2021-02-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Braille Transcriber Training Program
Prisoners
State Department Of Corrections
State Government - Title 41
Prisoners
State Department Of Corrections
State Government - Title 41