AZ HB2672 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Chapter 240
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Vacation rentals; short-term rentals; regulation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vacation rentals; short-term rentals; regulation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateChapter 240
2019-05-21SenateGovernor Signed
2019-05-15SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-05-15HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (42-18-0-0)
2019-05-15HouseHouse concurs
2019-05-07HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2019-05-07HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2019-05-06HouseTransmit to House
2019-05-06SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (17-12-1-0)
2019-04-30SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-04-02SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-02SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-01SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-03-28SenateSenate COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-2-2-0)
2019-03-13SenateSenate read second time
2019-03-12SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-03-12SenateAssigned to Senate COM Committee
2019-03-12SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-03-12SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-03-11HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (41-19-0-0)
2019-03-07HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-03-05HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-05HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-04HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2019-02-21HouseHouse GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-2-1-0-0-0)
2019-02-14HouseHouse read second time
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to House GOV Committee
2019-02-13HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11269.17Amended CodeSee Bill Text
422001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
422003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425042New CodeSee Bill Text
9500.39Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72315
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2672p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2672h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2672s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0240.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.2672kavanagh.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/h.2672government.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.2672ugenti-rita.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.2672ugenti-rita2.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.2672com.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.2672floorugenti-rita.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72315&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72315&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72315&billStatusActionId=188074&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72315&billStatusActionId=188169&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72315&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72315&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72315&billStatusActionId=189248&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72315&billStatusActionId=189390&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72315&billStatusActionId=189594&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72315&billStatusActionId=189595&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback