AZ HB2663 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Note: Replaces legislation SB1521

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Chapter 285
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

K-12 education; budget reconciliation; 2018-2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

K-12 education; budget reconciliation; 2018-2019.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Motion HB 2663 substituted for SB 1521. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House - (Y: 26 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-02 - House - House - (Y: 25 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-02 - House - House - (Y: 25 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-02 - House - House - (Y: 25 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-02 - House - House - (Y: 26 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03SenateChapter 285
2018-05-03SenateGovernor Signed
2018-05-03SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-05-03HouseTransmit to House
2018-05-03SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (20-9-1-0)
2018-05-03SenateSenate miscellaneous motion: HB 2663 substituted for SB 1521.
2018-05-03SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-05-03SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-05-03HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (33-26-1-0)
2018-05-02HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-05-02HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-05-02HouseHouse motion to amend
2018-05-02HouseHouse motion to amend
2018-05-02HouseHouse motion to amend
2018-05-02HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-05-02HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-2-0-1-0-0)
2018-05-02HouseHouse motion to amend
2018-05-02HouseHouse motion to amend
2018-05-01HouseHouse read second time
2018-05-01HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-5-0-2-0-0)
2018-04-30HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-04-30HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2018-04-30HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Same As/Similar To

SB1521 (Replaces) 2018-05-03 - Senate motion to amend

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15183Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15185Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15189.05New CodeSee Bill Text
152001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
152002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
152011Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
152032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
152041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15213Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15213.04New CodeSee Bill Text
15249.06Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15249.12New CodeSee Bill Text
15249.13New CodeSee Bill Text
15341Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15903Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15945Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411279.03Amended CodeSee Bill Text
413018.19Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
413022.18New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70964
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2663p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2663h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0285.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70964&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70964&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70964&billStatusActionId=183564&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70964&billStatusActionId=183567&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70964&billStatusActionId=183569&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70964&billStatusActionId=183565&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70964&billStatusActionId=183566&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70964&billStatusActionId=183568&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70964&billStatusActionId=183580&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70964&billStatusActionId=183584&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70964&billStatusActionId=183586&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback