AZ HB2661 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by SB1528
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Human services; budget reconciliation; 2018-2019.
Title
Human services; budget reconciliation; 2018-2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-05-02 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-05-02 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-05-02 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-2-0-1-0-0) |
2018-05-01 | House | House read second time |
2018-05-01 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-5-0-2-0-0) |
2018-04-30 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-04-30 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2018-04-30 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1528 (Replaced by) 2018-05-03 - Chapter 282
Subjects
Auditor General
Budget Bills
Budget Reconciliation
Department Of Child Safety
Department Of Economic Security
Human Services
Budget Bills
Budget Reconciliation
Department Of Child Safety
Department Of Economic Security
Human Services