AZ HB2659 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Chapter 70
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Chapter 70
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Organ transplants; disabilities; discrimination; prohibition
Title
Organ transplants; disabilities; discrimination; prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-25 | Senate | Chapter 70 |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-03-21 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-0-3-0) |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2022-02-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-14 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-07 | House | House read second time |
2022-02-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Civil Action (s)
Definitions (s)
Disabilities
Discrimination
Eligibility (s)
Organ Transplants
Prohibition
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Violation (s)
Definitions (s)
Disabilities
Discrimination
Eligibility (s)
Organ Transplants
Prohibition
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Violation (s)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 841 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 850.01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 850.02 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 851.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |