AZ HB2658 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by SB1525
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Environment; budget reconciliation; 2018-2019.
Title
Environment; budget reconciliation; 2018-2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-05-02 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-05-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-05-02 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-2-0-1-0-0) |
2018-05-01 | House | House read second time |
2018-05-01 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-5-0-2-0-0) |
2018-04-30 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-04-30 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2018-04-30 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1525 (Replaced by) 2018-05-03 - Chapter 280
Subjects
Budget Bills
Budget Reconciliation
Department Of Environmental Quality
Environment
Water Quality Assurance Revolving Fund
Budget Reconciliation
Department Of Environmental Quality
Environment
Water Quality Assurance Revolving Fund
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | 456 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 210 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |