AZ HB2654 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Patriotic youth groups; school access.
Title
Patriotic youth groups; school access.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Education Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Education Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (44-15-1-0) |
2020-03-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-19 | House | House TECH Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-11 | House | House ED Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-10 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | Assigned to House TECH Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |