AZ HB2648 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-23 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-23 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Rules committee; budget reconciliation bills
Title
Rules committee; budget reconciliation bills
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-23 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-22 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-22 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-18 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-18 | House third reading , voting: (49-5-6-0) | |
2010-03-18 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-03-02 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-02 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-02 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-0-2-2-0) | |
2010-02-08 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-23 | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2010-02-09 | House read second time | |
2010-02-08 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-08 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2010-02-08 | Introduced in House and read first time |