AZ HB2646 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Manslaughter; suicide assistance; violation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Manslaughter; suicide assistance; violation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03SenateSenate read second time
2020-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2020-03-02SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-02-28SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-02-27HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2020-02-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-02-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2020-02-24HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-24HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-24HouseHouse consent calendar
2020-02-24HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-19HouseHouse JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-1-0-0-0)
2020-02-04HouseHouse read second time
2020-02-03HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-02-03HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2020-02-03HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
131103Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback