AZ HB2639 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-18 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Dental assistants; education

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dental assistants; education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-18SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2024-03-05SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2024-03-05SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2024-03-04SenateSenate consent calendar
2024-03-04SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2024-02-27SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-1-2-0)
2024-02-21SenateSenate read second time
2024-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2024-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2024-02-20SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2024-02-06SenateTransmit to Senate
2024-02-06HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (41-14-2-0)
2024-02-05HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2024-01-30HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2024-01-30HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2024-01-29HouseHouse consent calendar
2024-01-29HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-1-0-0-0)
2024-01-24HouseHouse read second time
2024-01-24HouseHouse RA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-0-0-0)
2024-01-23HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2024-01-23HouseAssigned to House RA Committee
2024-01-23HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321291Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/80567
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/2r/bills/hb2639p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/2r/bills/hb2639h.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/511681
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/512289
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/513653
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/515971
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=80567&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=80567&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=80567&billStatusActionId=222697&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=80567&billStatusActionId=222915&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=80567&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=80567&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=80567&billStatusActionId=226201&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback