AZ HB2634 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Chapter 110
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Peace officers; discipline; hearings; discovery

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Peace officers; discipline; hearings; discovery

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateChapter 110
2019-04-18SenateGovernor Signed
2019-04-15SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-04-11HouseTransmit to House
2019-04-11SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (25-4-1-0)
2019-04-11SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2019-03-19SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-19SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-18SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-03-13SenateSenate TPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2019-03-04SenateSenate read second time
2019-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate TPS Committee
2019-02-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-02-27SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-02-26HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2019-02-25HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-25HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-20HouseHouse consent calendar
2019-02-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-0-2-0-0)
2019-02-20HouseHouse PS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-19HouseHouse read second time
2019-02-18HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-18HouseAssigned to House PS Committee
2019-02-18HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
381101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381106Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381110Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72265
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2634p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2634h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0110.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72265&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72265&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72265&billStatusActionId=187065&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72265&billStatusActionId=187101&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72265&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72265&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72265&billStatusActionId=188928&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72265&billStatusActionId=188934&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback