AZ HB2629 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - House third reading FAILED voting: (29-30-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - House third reading FAILED voting: (29-30-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Supreme court; attorney licensing
Title
Supreme court; attorney licensing
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony Kern [R] | Sen. Kelly Townsend [R] | Rep. Judy Burges [R] | Rep. John Allen [R] |
Rep. Mark Finchem [R] | Rep. Jay Lawrence [R] | Rep. Darin Mitchell [R] | Sen. Warren Petersen [R] |
Sen. Kelli Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (29-30-1-0) |
2015-03-09 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2015-03-03 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-03 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-02 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-2-0-2-0) |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-0-0-0) |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2015-02-12 | House | House read second time |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |